Senate | 05/11/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1056 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 535 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 535 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |