Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1601 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1601
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 13, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 13, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1601 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to railroads in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 81.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  "High-speed rail" means intercity passenger rail
 service that is reasonably expected to reach speeds of at least 110
 miles per hour.
 SECTION 2.  Section 81.002, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.002.  APPLICABILITY. In this title, a reference to a
 railroad company means [includes]:
 (1)  a railroad initially incorporated before
 September 1, 2007, under former Title 112, Revised Statutes; or
 (2)  any other legal entity operating a railroad,
 including an entity organized under the Texas Business Corporation
 Act or the Texas Corporation Law provisions of the Business
 Organizations Code, that owns or leases:
 (A)  locomotives and passenger or freight rail
 cars; and
 (B)  rights-of-way used for the purposes of
 transporting people or goods by rail between at least two
 terminuses.
 SECTION 3.  Section 112.002, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(5), a company that
 operates a high-speed rail system may not exercise the power of
 eminent domain for the system.
 SECTION 4.  Section 111.103(a), Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *