1 | 1 | | By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1601 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 13, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 13, 2015, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1601 By: Kolkhorst |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to railroads in this state. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 81.001, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
16 | 16 | | by adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (3) "High-speed rail" means intercity passenger rail |
---|
18 | 18 | | service that is reasonably expected to reach speeds of at least 110 |
---|
19 | 19 | | miles per hour. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 81.002, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
21 | 21 | | to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | Sec. 81.002. APPLICABILITY. In this title, a reference to a |
---|
23 | 23 | | railroad company means [includes]: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) a railroad initially incorporated before |
---|
25 | 25 | | September 1, 2007, under former Title 112, Revised Statutes; or |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) any other legal entity operating a railroad, |
---|
27 | 27 | | including an entity organized under the Texas Business Corporation |
---|
28 | 28 | | Act or the Texas Corporation Law provisions of the Business |
---|
29 | 29 | | Organizations Code, that owns or leases: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (A) locomotives and passenger or freight rail |
---|
31 | 31 | | cars; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (B) rights-of-way used for the purposes of |
---|
33 | 33 | | transporting people or goods by rail between at least two |
---|
34 | 34 | | terminuses. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 3. Section 112.002, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
36 | 36 | | by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (c) Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(5), a company that |
---|
38 | 38 | | operates a high-speed rail system may not exercise the power of |
---|
39 | 39 | | eminent domain for the system. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 4. Section 111.103(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
41 | 41 | | repealed. |
---|
42 | 42 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
43 | 43 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
44 | 44 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
45 | 45 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
46 | 46 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
47 | 47 | | * * * * * |
---|