Senate | 05/19/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1604 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1604 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA2 Menndez | Journal Page: 1604 |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA4 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 1604 |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1604 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 1604 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Menndez | Journal Page: 1603 |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1599 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 594 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |