1 | 1 | | By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1813 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 5, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 3; May 5, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to procedures for complaints filed with the Texas Medical |
---|
12 | 12 | | Board against physicians. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 154.053(a), Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
15 | 15 | | to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a) The board shall notify by personal delivery or certified |
---|
17 | 17 | | mail a physician who is the subject of a complaint filed with the |
---|
18 | 18 | | board that a complaint has been filed and shall provide [notify] the |
---|
19 | 19 | | physician with a full copy [of the nature] of the complaint, without |
---|
20 | 20 | | redaction, and a statement of the alleged violation in plain |
---|
21 | 21 | | language [unless the notice would jeopardize an investigation]. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. Section 154.0561, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
23 | 23 | | by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (e) The board shall deliver a copy of the preliminary and |
---|
25 | 25 | | final reports, including any dissenting or minority report, to the |
---|
26 | 26 | | physician who is the subject of the review. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (f) The name and medical credentials of each physician who |
---|
28 | 28 | | files an expert report shall be provided to the physician who is the |
---|
29 | 29 | | subject of the review. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 3. Not later than November 1, 2015, the Texas |
---|
31 | 31 | | Medical Board shall adopt the rules required to implement the |
---|
32 | 32 | | changes in law made by this Act. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 4. Sections 154.053 and 154.0561, Occupations Code, |
---|
34 | 34 | | as amended by this Act, apply only to a complaint filed on or after |
---|
35 | 35 | | November 1, 2015. A complaint filed before that date is governed by |
---|
36 | 36 | | the law in effect on the date the complaint was filed, and the |
---|
37 | 37 | | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
39 | 39 | | * * * * * |
---|