Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1813 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1813
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 5, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 3; May 5, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures for complaints filed with the Texas Medical
 Board against physicians.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 154.053(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall notify by personal delivery or certified
 mail a physician who is the subject of a complaint filed with the
 board that a complaint has been filed and shall provide [notify] the
 physician with a full copy [of the nature] of the complaint, without
 redaction, and a statement of the alleged violation in plain
 language [unless the notice would jeopardize an investigation].
 SECTION 2.  Section 154.0561, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  The board shall deliver a copy of the preliminary and
 final reports, including any dissenting or minority report, to the
 physician who is the subject of the review.
 (f)  The name and medical credentials of each physician who
 files an expert report shall be provided to the physician who is the
 subject of the review.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than November 1, 2015, the Texas
 Medical Board shall adopt the rules required to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 154.053 and 154.0561, Occupations Code,
 as amended by this Act, apply only to a complaint filed on or after
 November 1, 2015.  A complaint filed before that date is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the complaint was filed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *