House | 04/15/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |