Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB291 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nelson S.B. No. 291
 (In the Senate - Filed January 9, 2015; January 28, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 291 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the jurisdiction of a county court at law in Tarrant
 County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.2222(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A county court at law in Tarrant County has jurisdiction
 over all civil matters and causes, original and appellate,
 prescribed by law for county courts. The County Court at Law No. 1
 of Tarrant County also has jurisdiction over all criminal matters
 and causes, original and appellate, prescribed by law for county
 courts. The County Courts at Law Nos. 2 and 3 of Tarrant County do
 not have criminal jurisdiction. Notwithstanding any other
 provision, a county court at law in Tarrant County has jurisdiction
 on any appeal from a municipal court of record in Tarrant County
 that is not an appeal of a criminal law case or proceeding.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *