E
|
04/08/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
04/08/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
E
|
04/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 632
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#101
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c) and Rule 8, Section 1
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1043
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#96
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Isaac
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 14, Section 1, Section 741.2 Masons, and Article I, Section 16
|
Journal Page: 1041
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1041
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1040
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Isaac, Parker, Button, Lucio, E. Rodriguez, and Villalba
|
Journal Page: 1039
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1039
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 900
|
Journal Page: 1039
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 984
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 517
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 517
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 517
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 326
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 313
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 151
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 151
|
Senate
|
01/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|