Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 9, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill March 31, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2015
Bill March 2, 2015