House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1493 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 672 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |