Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB603 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 603
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2015; February 23, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; April 1, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 1, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Emissions Reduction Plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 386.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 386.002.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31,
 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 2.  Section 386.162, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 386.162.  EXPIRATION.  Notwithstanding Section
 386.002, this [This] subchapter expires August 31, 2017 [2015].
 SECTION 3.  Section 390.006, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 390.006.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31,
 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 4.  Section 391.304, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 391.304.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31,
 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 5.  Section 392.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 392.008.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31,
 2019 [2017].
 SECTION 6.  Section 393.007, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 393.007.  EXPIRATION.  This chapter expires August 31,
 2020 [2018].
 SECTION 7.  Section 394.012, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 394.012.  EXPIRATION.  This chapter expires August 31,
 2019 [2017].
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *