2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2015; February 23, 2015, |
---|
3 | | - | read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and |
---|
4 | | - | Economic Development; April 1, 2015, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | | - | following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 1, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 2 | | |
---|
8 | 3 | | |
---|
9 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 6 | | relating to the Texas Emissions Reduction Plan. |
---|
12 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 386.002, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
14 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 10 | | Sec. 386.002. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, |
---|
16 | 11 | | 2021 [2019]. |
---|
17 | 12 | | SECTION 2. Section 386.162, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
18 | 13 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 14 | | Sec. 386.162. EXPIRATION. Notwithstanding Section |
---|
20 | 15 | | 386.002, this [This] subchapter expires August 31, 2017 [2015]. |
---|
21 | 16 | | SECTION 3. Section 390.006, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
22 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
23 | 18 | | Sec. 390.006. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, |
---|
24 | 19 | | 2021 [2019]. |
---|
25 | 20 | | SECTION 4. Section 391.304, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
26 | 21 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
27 | 22 | | Sec. 391.304. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, |
---|
28 | 23 | | 2021 [2019]. |
---|
29 | 24 | | SECTION 5. Section 392.008, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
30 | 25 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
31 | 26 | | Sec. 392.008. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, |
---|
32 | 27 | | 2019 [2017]. |
---|
33 | 28 | | SECTION 6. Section 393.007, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
34 | 29 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
35 | 30 | | Sec. 393.007. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, |
---|
36 | 31 | | 2020 [2018]. |
---|
37 | 32 | | SECTION 7. Section 394.012, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
38 | 33 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
39 | 34 | | Sec. 394.012. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, |
---|
40 | 35 | | 2019 [2017]. |
---|
41 | 36 | | SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
42 | 37 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
43 | 38 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
44 | 39 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
45 | 40 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|