By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 603 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the Texas Emissions Reduction Plan. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 386.002, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 386.002. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, 2021 [2019]. SECTION 2. Section 386.162, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 386.162. EXPIRATION. Notwithstanding Section 386.002, this [This] subchapter expires August 31, 2017 [2015]. SECTION 3. Section 390.006, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 390.006. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, 2021 [2019]. SECTION 4. Section 391.304, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 391.304. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, 2021 [2019]. SECTION 5. Section 392.008, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 392.008. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, 2019 [2017]. SECTION 6. Section 393.007, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 393.007. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, 2020 [2018]. SECTION 7. Section 394.012, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 394.012. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, 2019 [2017]. SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.