House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2135 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1199 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |