Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB777 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fraser S.B. No. 777
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 777 By:  Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Public Utility Commission of Texas
 to restrict participation in the retail electric market for
 significant violations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.356, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If the commission suspends, revokes, or amends a
 retail electric provider's certificate under Subsection (a), the
 commission may, after notice and opportunity for hearing, prohibit
 an individual who is a principal or executive officer of the retail
 electric provider and who knew or reasonably should have known of
 the acts or omissions described by Subsection (a) that led to the
 suspension, revocation, or amendment of the certificate from
 participating in the retail electric market in Texas through
 ownership of or seeking employment by a retail electric provider,
 electric utility, billing agent, billing utility, aggregator, or
 person who assists in selection of a retail electric provider.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *