House
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1547
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1492
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 323
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 323
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|