House
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4786
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4786
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 351
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|