Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB911 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2015

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 911
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 911 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility for grants for natural gas fueling
 stations under the Texas natural gas vehicle grant program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 394.005(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  As a condition of receiving a grant, the qualifying
 vehicle must be continuously owned, leased, or otherwise
 commercially financed and registered and operated in the state by
 the grant recipient until the earlier of the fourth anniversary of
 the date of reimbursement of the grant-funded expenses or until the
 date the vehicle has been in operation for 400,000 miles after the
 date of reimbursement.  Not less than 75 percent of the annual use
 of the qualifying vehicle, either mileage or fuel use as determined
 by the commission, must occur in:
 (1)  the counties any part of which are included in the
 areas [area] described by Section 394.010(a-1) [394.010(a)]; or
 (2)  counties designated as nonattainment areas within
 the meaning of Section 107(d) of the federal Clean Air Act (42
 U.S.C. Section 7407).
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 394.010, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 394.010.  CLEAN TRANSPORTATION TRIANGLES [TRIANGLE].
 SECTION 3.  Section 394.010, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding Subsections
 (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Affected county" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 386.001.
 (2)  "State highway" means a highway in this state
 included in the plan providing for a system of state highways
 prepared by the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Transportation under Section 201.103, Transportation Code.
 (a-1)  To ensure that natural gas vehicles purchased,
 leased, or otherwise commercially financed or repowered under the
 program have access to fuel, and to build the foundation for a
 self-sustaining market for natural gas vehicles in Texas, the
 commission shall award grants to support the development of a
 network of natural gas vehicle fueling stations:
 (1)  along the interstate highways connecting Houston,
 San Antonio, Dallas, and Fort Worth;
 (2)  along the interstate highways connecting San
 Antonio to Corpus Christi and Laredo and the state highways
 connecting Corpus Christi and Laredo;[,] and
 (3)  in nonattainment areas and affected counties of
 the state.
 (a-2)  In awarding the grants, the commission shall provide
 for:
 (1)  strategically placed natural gas vehicle fueling
 stations:
 (A)  in and between the Houston, San Antonio, and
 Dallas-Fort Worth areas to enable a natural gas vehicle to travel in
 that triangular area relying solely on natural gas fuel;
 (B)  in and between the Corpus Christi, Laredo,
 and San Antonio areas to enable a natural gas vehicle to travel in
 that triangular area relying solely on natural gas fuel;[,] and
 (C)  in nonattainment areas and affected counties
 of the state, to enable a natural gas vehicle to travel in those
 areas relying solely on natural gas fuel;
 (2)  the grants to be dispersed through a competitive
 bidding process to offset a portion of the cost of installation of
 the natural gas dispensing equipment;
 (3)  contracts that require the recipient stations to
 meet operational, maintenance, and reporting requirements as
 specified by the commission; and
 (4)  a listing, to be maintained by the commission and
 made available to the public online, of all natural gas vehicle
 fueling stations that have received grant funding, including
 location and hours of operation.
 (d)  Stations funded by grants under this section must be
 publicly accessible.  In awarding grants for stations under this
 section, the [The] commission shall give preference to:
 (1)  stations providing both liquefied natural gas and
 compressed natural gas at a single location;
 (2)  stations located not more than one mile from an
 interstate highway [system]; and
 (3)  stations located in the triangular areas described
 by Subsections (a-2)(1)(A) and (B) [area between the Houston, San
 Antonio, and Dallas-Fort Worth areas].
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *