House | 05/26/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4344 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3226 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 352 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 352 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |