House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2548 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1027 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1580 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 353 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 353 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |