Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB931 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Fraser S.B. No. 931
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
4- Economic Development; March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with
5- favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8,
6- Nays 2; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 931 By: Fraser
1+By: Fraser, Campbell S.B. No. 931
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
136 relating to the goal for renewable energy and competitive renewable
147 energy zones.
158 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
169 SECTION 1. Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by
1710 amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), (h), (j), and (o) and adding
1811 Subsections (h-1) and (h-2) to read as follows:
1912 (a) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
2013 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
2114 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
2215 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
2316 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
2417 shall establish a target of 10,000 megawatts of installed renewable
2518 capacity by January 1, 2025. The cumulative installed renewable
2619 capacity in this state shall total 2,280 megawatts by January 1,
2720 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009, 4,264 megawatts by
2821 January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by January 1, 2013, and 5,880
2922 megawatts by January 1, 2015. Of the renewable energy technology
3023 generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this subsection
3124 after September 1, 2005, the commission shall establish a target of
3225 having at least 500 megawatts of capacity from a renewable energy
3326 technology other than a source using wind energy. The goal and
3427 targets established under this subsection terminate on December 31,
3528 2015.
3629 (b) The commission shall establish a renewable energy
3730 credits trading program. Before December 31, 2015, a [Any] retail
3831 electric provider, municipally owned utility, or electric
3932 cooperative that does not satisfy the requirements of Subsection
4033 (a) by directly owning or purchasing capacity using renewable
4134 energy technologies shall purchase sufficient renewable energy
4235 credits to satisfy the requirements by holding renewable energy
4336 credits in lieu of capacity from renewable energy technologies. On
4437 or after December 31, 2015, a retail electric provider shall
4538 purchase sufficient renewable energy credits to verify any
4639 marketing claims the provider makes related to the content of
4740 renewable energy, as determined by the commission.
4841 (c) Not later than January 1, 2000, the commission shall
4942 adopt rules necessary to administer and enforce this section. At a
5043 minimum, the rules shall:
5144 (1) establish the minimum annual renewable energy
5245 requirement for each retail electric provider, municipally owned
5346 utility, and electric cooperative operating in this state in a
5447 manner reasonably calculated by the commission to produce, on a
5548 statewide basis, compliance with the requirement prescribed by
5649 Subsection (a); and
5750 (2) specify reasonable performance standards that all
5851 renewable capacity additions must meet to earn renewable energy
5952 credits [count against the requirement prescribed by Subsection
6053 (a)] and that:
6154 (A) are designed and operated so as to maximize
6255 the energy output from the capacity additions in accordance with
6356 then-current industry standards; and
6457 (B) encourage the development, construction, and
6558 operation of new renewable energy projects at those sites in this
6659 state that have the greatest economic potential for capture and
6760 development of this state's environmentally beneficial renewable
6861 resources.
6962 (h) The commission, in consultation with the independent
7063 organization certified for ERCOT, shall plan for transmission needs
7164 related to the incorporation of renewable energy in a manner
7265 consistent with the planning process for other types of generation
7366 resources, including by considering in the planning process [In
7467 considering an application for a certificate of public convenience
7568 and necessity for a transmission project intended to serve a
7669 competitive renewable energy zone, the commission is not required
7770 to consider] the factors provided by Section 37.056 [Sections
7871 37.056(c)(1) and (2)].
7972 (h-1) The commission may not designate a new competitive
8073 renewable energy zone after January 1, 2015.
8174 (h-2) After January 1, 2015, the commission may not approve
8275 additional transmission facilities in a previously approved
8376 competitive renewable energy zone unless:
8477 (1) the facilities have been evaluated through the
8578 planning process described by Subsection (h); or
8679 (2) the addition of the facilities:
8780 (A) will cost not more than $130 million; and
8881 (B) involves adding a second circuit to existing
8982 single circuit lines and associated electrical equipment
9083 identified as necessary by the independent organization certified
9184 for ERCOT in a system planning report issued before May 1, 2014.
9285 (j) The commission, after consultation with each
9386 appropriate independent organization, electric reliability
9487 council, or regional transmission organization, shall file a report
9588 with the legislature not later than December 31 of each
9689 even-numbered year. The report must include[:
9790 [(1) an evaluation of the commission's implementation
9891 of competitive renewable energy zones;
9992 [(2) the estimated cost of transmission service
10093 improvements needed for each competitive renewable energy zone; and
10194 [(3)] an evaluation of the effects that additional
10295 renewable generation has on system reliability and on the cost of
10396 alternatives to mitigate the effects.
10497 (o) The commission may establish an alternative compliance
10598 payment to meet the goal established by Subsection (a) before its
10699 termination. An entity that has a renewable energy purchase
107100 requirement under this section may elect to pay the alternative
108101 compliance payment instead of applying renewable energy credits
109102 toward the satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this
110103 section. The commission may establish a separate alternative
111104 compliance payment for the goal of 500 megawatts of capacity from
112105 renewable energy technologies other than wind energy that an entity
113106 may use until January 1, 2016, to meet that goal. The alternative
114107 compliance payment for a renewable energy purchase requirement that
115108 could be satisfied with a renewable energy credit from wind energy
116109 may not be less than $2.50 per credit or greater than $20 per
117110 credit. Prior to September 1, 2009, an alternative compliance
118111 payment under this subsection may not be set above $5 per credit.
119112 In implementing this subsection, the commission shall consider:
120113 (1) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
121114 retail competition;
122115 (2) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
123116 electric rates;
124117 (3) the effect of the alternative compliance payment
125118 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
126119 (4) any other factors necessary to ensure the
127120 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
128121 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate increases.
129122 SECTION 2. The recovery of a transmission facility
130123 investment made by an electric utility to serve a competitive
131124 renewable energy zone is governed by the law in effect on the date
132125 the facility is placed in service, regardless of whether the
133126 facility is completed before, on, or after the effective date of
134127 this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
135128 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
136129 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
137130 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
138131 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
139132 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
140- * * * * *