Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB931 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fraser S.B. No. 931
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 2; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 931 By:  Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the goal for renewable energy and competitive renewable
 energy zones.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), (h), (j), and (o) and adding
 Subsections (h-1) and (h-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
 state.  The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
 shall establish a target of 10,000 megawatts of installed renewable
 capacity by January 1, 2025.  The cumulative installed renewable
 capacity in this state shall total 2,280 megawatts by January 1,
 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009, 4,264 megawatts by
 January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by January 1, 2013, and 5,880
 megawatts by January 1, 2015.  Of the renewable energy technology
 generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this subsection
 after September 1, 2005, the commission shall establish a target of
 having at least 500 megawatts of capacity from a renewable energy
 technology other than a source using wind energy.  The goal and
 targets established under this subsection terminate on December 31,
 2015.
 (b)  The commission shall establish a renewable energy
 credits trading program.  Before December 31, 2015, a [Any] retail
 electric provider, municipally owned utility, or electric
 cooperative that does not satisfy the requirements of Subsection
 (a) by directly owning or purchasing capacity using renewable
 energy technologies shall purchase sufficient renewable energy
 credits to satisfy the requirements by holding renewable energy
 credits in lieu of capacity from renewable energy technologies.  On
 or after December 31, 2015, a retail electric provider shall
 purchase sufficient renewable energy credits to verify any
 marketing claims the provider makes related to the content of
 renewable energy, as determined by the commission.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2000, the commission shall
 adopt rules necessary to administer and enforce this section. At a
 minimum, the rules shall:
 (1)  establish the minimum annual renewable energy
 requirement for each retail electric provider, municipally owned
 utility, and electric cooperative operating in this state in a
 manner reasonably calculated by the commission to produce, on a
 statewide basis, compliance with the requirement prescribed by
 Subsection (a); and
 (2)  specify reasonable performance standards that all
 renewable capacity additions must meet to earn renewable energy
 credits [count against the requirement prescribed by Subsection
 (a)] and that:
 (A)  are designed and operated so as to maximize
 the energy output from the capacity additions in accordance with
 then-current industry standards; and
 (B)  encourage the development, construction, and
 operation of new renewable energy projects at those sites in this
 state that have the greatest economic potential for capture and
 development of this state's environmentally beneficial renewable
 resources.
 (h)  The commission, in consultation with the independent
 organization certified for ERCOT, shall plan for transmission needs
 related to the incorporation of renewable energy in a manner
 consistent with the planning process for other types of generation
 resources, including by considering in the planning process [In
 considering an application for a certificate of public convenience
 and necessity for a transmission project intended to serve a
 competitive renewable energy zone, the commission is not required
 to consider] the factors provided by Section 37.056 [Sections
 37.056(c)(1) and (2)].
 (h-1)  The commission may not designate a new competitive
 renewable energy zone after January 1, 2015.
 (h-2)  After January 1, 2015, the commission may not approve
 additional transmission facilities in a previously approved
 competitive renewable energy zone unless:
 (1)  the facilities have been evaluated through the
 planning process described by Subsection (h); or
 (2)  the addition of the facilities:
 (A)  will cost not more than $130 million; and
 (B)  involves adding a second circuit to existing
 single circuit lines and associated electrical equipment
 identified as necessary by the independent organization certified
 for ERCOT in a system planning report issued before May 1, 2014.
 (j)  The commission, after consultation with each
 appropriate independent organization, electric reliability
 council, or regional transmission organization, shall file a report
 with the legislature not later than December 31 of each
 even-numbered year.  The report must include[:
 [(1)     an evaluation of the commission's implementation
 of competitive renewable energy zones;
 [(2)     the estimated cost of transmission service
 improvements needed for each competitive renewable energy zone; and
 [(3)]  an evaluation of the effects that additional
 renewable generation has on system reliability and on the cost of
 alternatives to mitigate the effects.
 (o)  The commission may establish an alternative compliance
 payment to meet the goal established by Subsection (a) before its
 termination.  An entity that has a renewable energy purchase
 requirement under this section may elect to pay the alternative
 compliance payment instead of applying renewable energy credits
 toward the satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this
 section.  The commission may establish a separate alternative
 compliance payment for the goal of 500 megawatts of capacity from
 renewable energy technologies other than wind energy that an entity
 may use until January 1, 2016, to meet that goal.  The alternative
 compliance payment for a renewable energy purchase requirement that
 could be satisfied with a renewable energy credit from wind energy
 may not be less than $2.50 per credit or greater than $20 per
 credit.  Prior to September 1, 2009, an alternative compliance
 payment under this subsection may not be set above $5 per credit.
 In implementing this subsection, the commission shall consider:
 (1)  the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 retail competition;
 (2)  the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 electric rates;
 (3)  the effect of the alternative compliance payment
 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
 (4)  any other factors necessary to ensure the
 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate increases.
 SECTION 2.  The recovery of a transmission facility
 investment made by an electric utility to serve a competitive
 renewable energy zone is governed by the law in effect on the date
 the facility is placed in service, regardless of whether the
 facility is completed before, on, or after the effective date of
 this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *