E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3103 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1741 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1691 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1209 | Journal Page: 3823 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3823 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HCR 57 | Journal Page: 3823 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 2342 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 344 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 284 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 284 | |
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |