Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 17, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2015
Bill March 11, 2015