E | 03/24/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 574 | |
E | 03/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 421 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 377 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 362 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 583 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 583 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |