E | 06/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3646 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4467 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1860 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4077 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4077 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 758 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 707 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |