Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR28 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill March 13, 2015

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2015