Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR28 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Lucio S.C.R. No. 28
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
4- Relations; April 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+S.C.R. No. 28
72
83
94 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
105 WHEREAS, Since the 1970s, April has been set aside as
116 National Autism Awareness Month in order to inform the public about
127 autism and issues within the autism community; and
138 WHEREAS, Autism spectrum disorder and autism are general
149 terms for a group of complex disorders of brain development; they
1510 are characterized by varying levels of difficulty in social
1611 interaction, verbal and nonverbal communication, and repetitive
1712 behaviors; and
1813 WHEREAS, According to the United States Centers for Disease
1914 Control and Prevention, 1 in every 68 children is affected by
2015 autism, compared with 1 in 150 a decade ago; the Autism Society
2116 calculates that more than 3.5 million Americans of all ages live
2217 with an autism spectrum disorder; and
2318 WHEREAS, The cause of this disorder is unknown, but
2419 behavioral intervention can dramatically improve outcomes; early
2520 diagnosis and intervention are crucial to ensure effective
2621 treatment that can help these valuable members of society use their
2722 skills and talents to reach their full potential; now, therefore,
2823 be it
2924 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
3025 hereby recognize April 2015 as Autism Awareness Month and encourage
3126 all Texans to learn more about autism spectrum disorder.
32- * * * * *
27+ ______________________________ ______________________________
28+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
29+ I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 28 was adopted by the Senate
30+ on April 9, 2015.
31+ ______________________________
32+ Secretary of the Senate
33+ I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 28 was adopted by the House
34+ on May 21, 2015.
35+ ______________________________
36+ Chief Clerk of the House
37+ Approved:
38+ ______________________________
39+ Date
40+ ______________________________
41+ Governor