E | 06/16/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1974 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4105 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#1291 | Journal Page: 4104 |
House | 05/22/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4104 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4104 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4088 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3264 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 766 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 766 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |