Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR39 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill April 9, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015