House | 05/23/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4338 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1431 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |