Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR44 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Campbell, Zaffirini S.C.R. No. 44
2- (In the Senate - Filed May 7, 2015; May 7, 2015, read first
3- time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military
4- Installations; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
72
83
94 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
105 WHEREAS, The Texas Legislative Medal of Honor was established
116 to recognize gallant and intrepid service by a member of the state
127 or federal military forces, and Cleto L. Rodriguez proved himself a
138 deserving recipient of this prestigious award; and
149 WHEREAS, Born in San Marcos on April 26, 1923, Cleto
1510 Rodriguez lost both his parents when he was nine, and he moved to
1611 San Antonio to live with relatives; he joined the United States Army
1712 in 1944, becoming a private in Company B of the 148th Infantry; and
1813 WHEREAS, On February 9, 1945, during the battle for Manila in
1914 the Philippines, Private Rodriguez and his unit were advancing on
2015 the heavily defended Paco Railroad Station when they were pinned
2116 down by intense enemy fire; at that point, Private Rodriguez and
2217 Private First Class John Reese took the initiative to charge the
2318 enemy position; the two men reached a house 60 yards from the
2419 Japanese emplacements, and from that location, under the gaze of
2520 enemy gunners, they killed 35 combatants; and
2621 WHEREAS, On moving closer to their objective, the pair
2722 spotted Japanese reinforcements moving toward the station;
2823 Privates Rodriguez and Reese killed more than 40 of the group, which
2924 discouraged further attempts to reinforce the Japanese defenses;
3025 Private Reese then provided covering fire as Private Rodriguez ran
3126 forward and lobbed five grenades into the station doorway,
3227 destroying a 20mm gun and a heavy machine gun and eliminating their
3328 crews; as the pair withdrew to their own lines, Private Reese was
3429 mortally wounded; and
3530 WHEREAS, The bold actions of Privates Rodriguez and Reese
3631 threw Japanese defenses at the station into disarray and made
3732 possible the subsequent seizure of the stronghold; two days later,
3833 Private Rodriguez again enabled his comrades to move forward when
3934 he singlehandedly killed six more enemy soldiers and took out
4035 another 20mm gun; for having materially aided the advance of United
4136 States troops in Manila, he was awarded the Medal of Honor; and
4237 WHEREAS, Upon his return to San Antonio, Cleto Rodriguez was
4338 presented with the key to the city; he worked as a representative
4439 for the Veterans Administration and then served in the United
4540 States Air Force from 1952 to 1954 and in the army from 1955 to 1970,
4641 rising to the rank of master sergeant before his retirement; over
4742 the years, he also served his community as a member of the League of
4843 United Latin American Citizens; his boyhood elementary school was
4944 renamed in his honor in 1975; and
5045 WHEREAS, Married to Flora Muniz in November 1945, Cleto
5146 Rodriguez became the proud father of four children; he passed away
5247 on December 7, 1990, and was buried at Fort Sam Houston National
5348 Cemetery; the following year, a section of United States Route 90 in
5449 San Antonio was named after him; the city has two murals featuring
5550 his likeness, at the Cassiano Homes housing project and at the San
5651 Antonio Central Library; and
5752 WHEREAS, Cleto Rodriguez repeatedly risked his life to
5853 complete his mission and save the lives of his fellow soldiers, and
5954 for his remarkable heroism, he is most assuredly deserving of this
6055 state's supreme military award; now, therefore, be it
6156 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
6257 hereby direct the governor of the State of Texas to posthumously
6358 award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to Cleto L. Rodriguez in
6459 recognition of his valiant service during World War II.
65- * * * * *