Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR44 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Campbell, Zaffirini S.C.R. No. 44
 (In the Senate - Filed May 7, 2015; May 7, 2015, read first
 time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military
 Installations; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Texas Legislative Medal of Honor was established
 to recognize gallant and intrepid service by a member of the state
 or federal military forces, and Cleto L. Rodriguez proved himself a
 deserving recipient of this prestigious award; and
 WHEREAS, Born in San Marcos on April 26, 1923, Cleto
 Rodriguez lost both his parents when he was nine, and he moved to
 San Antonio to live with relatives; he joined the United States Army
 in 1944, becoming a private in Company B of the 148th Infantry; and
 WHEREAS, On February 9, 1945, during the battle for Manila in
 the Philippines, Private Rodriguez and his unit were advancing on
 the heavily defended Paco Railroad Station when they were pinned
 down by intense enemy fire; at that point, Private Rodriguez and
 Private First Class John Reese took the initiative to charge the
 enemy position; the two men reached a house 60 yards from the
 Japanese emplacements, and from that location, under the gaze of
 enemy gunners, they killed 35 combatants; and
 WHEREAS, On moving closer to their objective, the pair
 spotted Japanese reinforcements moving toward the station;
 Privates Rodriguez and Reese killed more than 40 of the group, which
 discouraged further attempts to reinforce the Japanese defenses;
 Private Reese then provided covering fire as Private Rodriguez ran
 forward and lobbed five grenades into the station doorway,
 destroying a 20mm gun and a heavy machine gun and eliminating their
 crews; as the pair withdrew to their own lines, Private Reese was
 mortally wounded; and
 WHEREAS, The bold actions of Privates Rodriguez and Reese
 threw Japanese defenses at the station into disarray and made
 possible the subsequent seizure of the stronghold; two days later,
 Private Rodriguez again enabled his comrades to move forward when
 he singlehandedly killed six more enemy soldiers and took out
 another 20mm gun; for having materially aided the advance of United
 States troops in Manila, he was awarded the Medal of Honor; and
 WHEREAS, Upon his return to San Antonio, Cleto Rodriguez was
 presented with the key to the city; he worked as a representative
 for the Veterans Administration and then served in the United
 States Air Force from 1952 to 1954 and in the army from 1955 to 1970,
 rising to the rank of master sergeant before his retirement; over
 the years, he also served his community as a member of the League of
 United Latin American Citizens; his boyhood elementary school was
 renamed in his honor in 1975; and
 WHEREAS, Married to Flora Muniz in November 1945, Cleto
 Rodriguez became the proud father of four children; he passed away
 on December 7, 1990, and was buried at Fort Sam Houston National
 Cemetery; the following year, a section of United States Route 90 in
 San Antonio was named after him; the city has two murals featuring
 his likeness, at the Cassiano Homes housing project and at the San
 Antonio Central Library; and
 WHEREAS, Cleto Rodriguez repeatedly risked his life to
 complete his mission and save the lives of his fellow soldiers, and
 for his remarkable heroism, he is most assuredly deserving of this
 state's supreme military award; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby direct the governor of the State of Texas to posthumously
 award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to Cleto L. Rodriguez in
 recognition of his valiant service during World War II.
 * * * * *