Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1131 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/18/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R5245 BEE-D
 By: Miller H.B. No. 1131


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that a person obtain a dyslexia
 therapist license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 403, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.004.  EXEMPTION FROM LICENSING REQUIREMENT FOR
 SUPERVISED ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES. Section 403.101(b) does not
 apply to the activities and services of a person who is completing
 supervised clinical experience as required by Section
 403.105(a)(3), to the extent that the activities and services
 satisfy the requirements of Section 403.105(b).
 SECTION 2.  Section 403.101, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 403.101.  LICENSE REQUIRED. (a) A person may not use
 the title "licensed dyslexia practitioner" or "licensed dyslexia
 therapist" in this state unless the person holds the appropriate
 license under this chapter.
 (b)  A person may not provide multisensory structured
 language education or dyslexia therapy services outside of an
 educational setting, including a school, learning center, or
 clinic, unless the person holds a licensed dyslexia therapist
 license.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 403, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.111 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.111.  TEMPORARY DYSLEXIA THERAPIST LICENSE. (a)
 The department shall issue a temporary dyslexia therapist license
 to an applicant who satisfies all eligibility requirements under
 Section 403.105, other than the education required by Section
 403.105(a)(1).
 (b)  A temporary license is valid until the earlier of:
 (1)  September 1, 2022; or
 (2)  the date on which the department issues a licensed
 dyslexia therapist license to the applicant.
 (c)  The department shall issue a licensed dyslexia
 therapist license to the holder of a temporary license under this
 section if the temporary license holder satisfies the requirement
 under Section 403.105(a)(1).
 (d)  This section expires January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  Section 403.151(b), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A licensed dyslexia therapist may practice in any [a
 school, learning center, clinic, or private practice] setting.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 conduct that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 Conduct that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 (b)  Section 403.101(b), Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act, takes effect January 1, 2018.