E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4363
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1296
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1812
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#378
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#370
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
3-Stickland
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 460
|
House
|
01/25/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|