Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1260 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phelan (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1260
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of commercial shrimp unloading;
 requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47.0091, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 47.0091.  PURCHASE OF AQUATIC PRODUCTS BY WHOLESALE
 FISH DEALERS. No wholesale fish dealer may purchase for resale or
 receive for sale, barter, exchange, or any other commercial purpose
 any aquatic product from any person or entity in this state unless
 he purchases the product from the holder of:
 (1)  a general commercial fisherman's license;
 (2)  a commercial oyster fisherman's license;
 (3)  a commercial oyster boat license;
 (4)  a wholesale fish dealer's license;
 (5)  a fish farmer's license;
 (6)  a commercial shrimp boat license;
 (7)  a commercial oyster boat captain's license;
 (8)  a commercial shrimp boat captain's license;
 (9)  a commercial crab fisherman's license; [or]
 (10)  a commercial finfish fisherman's license; or
 (11)  a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license.
 SECTION 2.  Section 47.0111, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 47.0111.  PURCHASE OF AQUATIC PRODUCTS BY RETAIL FISH
 DEALERS. No retail fish dealer may purchase for resale or receive
 for sale, barter, exchange, or any other commercial purposes any
 aquatic products from any person or entity in this state unless he
 purchases the product from the holder of:
 (1)  a wholesale fish dealer's license;
 (2)  a general commercial fisherman's license, a
 commercial shrimp boat license, a commercial shrimp boat captain's
 license, a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license, a commercial
 crab fisherman's license, or a commercial finfish fisherman's
 license when the retail fish dealer has given written notification
 to the director or his designee of the dealer's intent to purchase
 aquatic products from the holder of a general commercial
 fisherman's license, a commercial shrimp boat license, a commercial
 shrimp boat captain's license, a commercial crab fisherman's
 license, or a commercial finfish fisherman's license; or
 (3)  a fish farmer's license.
 SECTION 3.  Section 47.012, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 47.012.  PURCHASE OF AQUATIC PRODUCTS BY RESTAURANT
 OWNER, OPERATOR, OR EMPLOYEE. No restaurant owner, operator, or
 employee may purchase for consumption by the restaurant's patrons
 on the restaurant's premises any aquatic product from any person or
 entity in this state unless the person purchases the aquatic
 product from the holder of:
 (1)  a wholesale fish dealer's license;
 (2)  a general commercial fisherman's license;
 (3)  a fish farmer's license;
 (4)  a commercial shrimp boat license;
 (5)  a commercial shrimp boat captain's license;
 (6)  a commercial crab fisherman's license; [or]
 (7)  a commercial finfish fisherman's license; or
 (8)  a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 77, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 77.034 to read as follows:
 Sec. 77.034.  COMMERCIAL GULF SHRIMP UNLOADING LICENSE. (a)
 Except as provided by Subsection (b), no person may unload or allow
 to be unloaded at a port or point in this state shrimp or other
 aquatic products caught or taken from the outside water or from salt
 water outside the state without having been previously unloaded in
 some other state or foreign country, unless the person has
 obtained:
 (1)  a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license; and
 (2)  a federal commercial vessel permit for gulf shrimp
 from the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration.
 (b)  A person holding a valid resident or nonresident
 commercial gulf shrimp boat license is exempt from the requirement
 to hold a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license.
 (c)  A vessel operating under a commercial gulf shrimp
 unloading license must make a nonstop progression through outside
 waters to a place of unloading. The commission shall adopt rules for
 the requirements of trawl gear storage for a vessel who holds a
 commercial gulf shrimp unloading license while that vessel is
 making a nonstop progression through outside waters to a place of
 unloading.
 (d)  The fee for a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license
 is $1485, or an amount set by the commission, whichever amount is
 more.
 SECTION 5.  Section 77.035(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as permitted under Section 77.034, no [No] person
 may operate a commercial gulf shrimp boat for catching or assisting
 in catching shrimp and other edible aquatic products from the
 outside water, or have on board a boat, or unload, or allow to be
 unloaded at a port or point in this state, shrimp and other edible
 aquatic products caught or taken from the outside water or from salt
 water outside the state without having been previously unloaded in
 some other state or foreign country, unless the owner of the boat
 has obtained a commercial gulf shrimp boat license.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 77.0352(a) and (b), Parks and Wildlife
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The holder of a commercial shrimp boat license or
 commercial gulf shrimp unloading license may sell only the catch of
 shrimp from the vessel to which the commercial shrimp boat license
 or commercial gulf shrimp unloading license applies.
 (b)  The holder of a commercial shrimp boat license or
 commercial gulf shrimp unloading license may sell aquatic products
 other than shrimp if those aquatic products:
 (1)  were taken incidental to lawful shrimping on the
 vessel to which the commercial shrimp boat license or commercial
 gulf shrimp unloading license applies; and
 (2)  comply with all applicable provisions of this code
 or commission regulations.
 SECTION 7.  Section 77.039(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A commercial shrimp boat license or commercial gulf
 shrimp unloading license issued under this subchapter must be a
 sign or emblem at least 32 square inches in size and be constructed
 of a durable material.
 SECTION 8.  The Parks and Wildlife Commission shall adopt
 rules not later than September 1, 2018, to implement Sections
 77.034, Parks and Wildlife Code, as added by this Act, and 77.039,
 Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *