Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1260 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Phelan (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1260
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2017;
3- May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported
5- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2017,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1260
82
93
10- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
114 AN ACT
125 relating to the regulation of commercial shrimp unloading;
136 requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.
147 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
158 SECTION 1. Section 47.0091, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
169 amended to read as follows:
1710 Sec. 47.0091. PURCHASE OF AQUATIC PRODUCTS BY WHOLESALE
1811 FISH DEALERS. No wholesale fish dealer may purchase for resale or
1912 receive for sale, barter, exchange, or any other commercial purpose
2013 any aquatic product from any person or entity in this state unless
2114 he purchases the product from the holder of:
2215 (1) a general commercial fisherman's license;
2316 (2) a commercial oyster fisherman's license;
2417 (3) a commercial oyster boat license;
2518 (4) a wholesale fish dealer's license;
2619 (5) a fish farmer's license;
2720 (6) a commercial shrimp boat license;
2821 (7) a commercial oyster boat captain's license;
2922 (8) a commercial shrimp boat captain's license;
3023 (9) a commercial crab fisherman's license; [or]
3124 (10) a commercial finfish fisherman's license; or
3225 (11) a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license.
3326 SECTION 2. Section 47.0111, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
3427 amended to read as follows:
3528 Sec. 47.0111. PURCHASE OF AQUATIC PRODUCTS BY RETAIL FISH
3629 DEALERS. No retail fish dealer may purchase for resale or receive
3730 for sale, barter, exchange, or any other commercial purposes any
3831 aquatic products from any person or entity in this state unless he
3932 purchases the product from the holder of:
4033 (1) a wholesale fish dealer's license;
4134 (2) a general commercial fisherman's license, a
4235 commercial shrimp boat license, a commercial shrimp boat captain's
4336 license, a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license, a commercial
4437 crab fisherman's license, or a commercial finfish fisherman's
4538 license when the retail fish dealer has given written notification
4639 to the director or his designee of the dealer's intent to purchase
4740 aquatic products from the holder of a general commercial
4841 fisherman's license, a commercial shrimp boat license, a commercial
4942 shrimp boat captain's license, a commercial crab fisherman's
5043 license, or a commercial finfish fisherman's license; or
5144 (3) a fish farmer's license.
5245 SECTION 3. Section 47.012, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
5346 amended to read as follows:
5447 Sec. 47.012. PURCHASE OF AQUATIC PRODUCTS BY RESTAURANT
5548 OWNER, OPERATOR, OR EMPLOYEE. No restaurant owner, operator, or
5649 employee may purchase for consumption by the restaurant's patrons
5750 on the restaurant's premises any aquatic product from any person or
5851 entity in this state unless the person purchases the aquatic
5952 product from the holder of:
6053 (1) a wholesale fish dealer's license;
6154 (2) a general commercial fisherman's license;
6255 (3) a fish farmer's license;
6356 (4) a commercial shrimp boat license;
6457 (5) a commercial shrimp boat captain's license;
6558 (6) a commercial crab fisherman's license; [or]
6659 (7) a commercial finfish fisherman's license; or
6760 (8) a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license.
6861 SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 77, Parks and Wildlife
6962 Code, is amended by adding Section 77.034 to read as follows:
7063 Sec. 77.034. COMMERCIAL GULF SHRIMP UNLOADING LICENSE. (a)
7164 Except as provided by Subsection (b), no person may unload or allow
7265 to be unloaded at a port or point in this state shrimp or other
7366 aquatic products caught or taken from the outside water or from salt
7467 water outside the state without having been previously unloaded in
7568 some other state or foreign country, unless the person has
7669 obtained:
7770 (1) a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license; and
7871 (2) a federal commercial vessel permit for gulf shrimp
7972 from the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration.
8073 (b) A person holding a valid resident or nonresident
8174 commercial gulf shrimp boat license is exempt from the requirement
8275 to hold a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license.
8376 (c) A vessel operating under a commercial gulf shrimp
8477 unloading license must make a nonstop progression through outside
8578 waters to a place of unloading. The commission shall adopt rules for
8679 the requirements of trawl gear storage for a vessel who holds a
8780 commercial gulf shrimp unloading license while that vessel is
8881 making a nonstop progression through outside waters to a place of
8982 unloading.
9083 (d) The fee for a commercial gulf shrimp unloading license
9184 is $1485, or an amount set by the commission, whichever amount is
9285 more.
9386 SECTION 5. Section 77.035(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
9487 amended to read as follows:
9588 (a) Except as permitted under Section 77.034, no [No] person
9689 may operate a commercial gulf shrimp boat for catching or assisting
9790 in catching shrimp and other edible aquatic products from the
9891 outside water, or have on board a boat, or unload, or allow to be
9992 unloaded at a port or point in this state, shrimp and other edible
10093 aquatic products caught or taken from the outside water or from salt
10194 water outside the state without having been previously unloaded in
10295 some other state or foreign country, unless the owner of the boat
10396 has obtained a commercial gulf shrimp boat license.
10497 SECTION 6. Sections 77.0352(a) and (b), Parks and Wildlife
10598 Code, are amended to read as follows:
10699 (a) The holder of a commercial shrimp boat license or
107100 commercial gulf shrimp unloading license may sell only the catch of
108101 shrimp from the vessel to which the commercial shrimp boat license
109102 or commercial gulf shrimp unloading license applies.
110103 (b) The holder of a commercial shrimp boat license or
111104 commercial gulf shrimp unloading license may sell aquatic products
112105 other than shrimp if those aquatic products:
113106 (1) were taken incidental to lawful shrimping on the
114107 vessel to which the commercial shrimp boat license or commercial
115108 gulf shrimp unloading license applies; and
116109 (2) comply with all applicable provisions of this code
117110 or commission regulations.
118111 SECTION 7. Section 77.039(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
119112 amended to read as follows:
120113 (a) A commercial shrimp boat license or commercial gulf
121114 shrimp unloading license issued under this subchapter must be a
122115 sign or emblem at least 32 square inches in size and be constructed
123116 of a durable material.
124117 SECTION 8. The Parks and Wildlife Commission shall adopt
125118 rules not later than September 1, 2018, to implement Sections
126119 77.034, Parks and Wildlife Code, as added by this Act, and 77.039,
127120 Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act.
128121 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
129- * * * * *
122+ ______________________________ ______________________________
123+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
124+ I certify that H.B. No. 1260 was passed by the House on April
125+ 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 13, 2 present, not
126+ voting.
127+ ______________________________
128+ Chief Clerk of the House
129+ I certify that H.B. No. 1260 was passed by the Senate on May
130+ 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
131+ ______________________________
132+ Secretary of the Senate
133+ APPROVED: _____________________
134+ Date
135+ _____________________
136+ Governor