E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5095 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4358 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3997 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Record vote | RV#258 | Journal Page: 1520 |
House | 04/17/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1520 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1520 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Postponed | 4/17/17 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 1501 |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Record vote | RV#233 | Journal Page: 1467 |
House | 04/12/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1467 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1467 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 02/09/2017 | Filed |