Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1699 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1699
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the participation by qualified persons in the
 Department of Public Safety's driver record monitoring pilot
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 521.062, Transportation Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (j) and adding Subsections
 (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b)  Under the pilot program, the department shall:
 (1)  [may] enter into a contract with any [a] person
 qualified to provide driver record monitoring services, as
 described by Subsection (c); [,] and
 (2)  provide certain information from the department's
 driver's license records to the person as provided by this section.
 (b-1)  A person is qualified to provide driver record
 monitoring services [,] if the person:
 (1)  has submitted an application to the department;
 (2) [(1)]  is an employer, an insurer, an insurance
 support organization, an employer support organization, or an
 entity that self-insures its motor vehicles; and
 (3) [(2)]  is eligible to receive the information under
 Chapter 730.
 (b-2)  The department may not limit the number of qualified
 persons participating in the pilot program.
 (j)  The department shall accept and consider applications
 [may establish a reasonable deadline by which a person must apply]
 to enter into a contract with the department under this section
 until the conclusion of the term of the pilot program [and may not
 enter into a contract with a person who fails to apply before that
 deadline].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *