E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4175
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#768
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2555
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2406
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#699
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 9 and Rule 4, Section 10
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/3/17 3:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|