Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1917 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1917
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 10, 2017, rereferred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 1, 1 present not voting; May 17, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contract requirements for prescription drug benefits
 provided by Medicaid managed care organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 533.005(a-1), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The requirements imposed by Subsections (a)(23)(A),
 (B), and (C) do not apply, and may not be enforced, on and after
 August 31, 2023 [2018].
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *