1 | | - | By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1917 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
4 | | - | Commerce; May 10, 2017, rereferred to Committee on Health & Human |
---|
5 | | - | Services; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
6 | | - | Yeas 7, Nays 1, 1 present not voting; May 17, 2017, sent to |
---|
7 | | - | printer.) |
---|
8 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1917 |
---|
12 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 5 | | relating to contract requirements for prescription drug benefits |
---|
14 | 6 | | provided by Medicaid managed care organizations. |
---|
15 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 533.005(a-1), Government Code, is |
---|
17 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 10 | | (a-1) The requirements imposed by Subsections (a)(23)(A), |
---|
19 | 11 | | (B), and (C) do not apply, and may not be enforced, on and after |
---|
20 | 12 | | August 31, 2023 [2018]. |
---|
21 | 13 | | SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
22 | 14 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
23 | 15 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
24 | 16 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
25 | 17 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
26 | 18 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
27 | 19 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
28 | 20 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
29 | 21 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
30 | 22 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
31 | 23 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
32 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 24 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 25 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 26 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1917 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
| 27 | + | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 102, Nays 41, 2 present, not |
---|
| 28 | + | voting. |
---|
| 29 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 30 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 31 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1917 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 32 | + | 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7. |
---|
| 33 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 34 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 35 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 36 | + | Date |
---|
| 37 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 38 | + | Governor |
---|