Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1318
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1318
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1554
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1554
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#269
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 688
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 688
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|