Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2253 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2253
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2017;
 April 26, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 1;
 May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2253 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the interest rate on a refund of ad valorem taxes made
 following the final determination of an appeal that decreases a
 property owner's tax liability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.43(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  For a refund made under this section, the taxing unit
 shall include with the refund interest on the amount refunded
 calculated at an annual rate that is equal to the sum of two percent
 and the most recent prime rate quoted and published by the Federal
 Reserve Board as of the first day of the month in which the refund is
 made, but not more than a total of eight [of 9.5] percent,
 calculated from the delinquency date for the taxes until the date
 the refund is made.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a tax refund that is made following an appeal that is filed on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A tax refund that is made
 following an appeal that is filed before the effective date of this
 Act is determined by the law in effect when the appeal is filed, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *