Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 22, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill April 18, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2017
Bill April 11, 2017