Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill November 14, 2016

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2017
Bill March 29, 2017