Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB239 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hernandez, White (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 239
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report regarding the confinement of pregnant inmates
 by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "department" means the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 (b)  The department shall prepare a report on the confinement
 of pregnant inmates in facilities operated by or under contract
 with the department. The report must include:
 (1)  a description of the department's implementation
 of policies and procedures to provide adequate care to pregnant
 inmates while confined in a facility operated by or under contract
 with the department, and any policies adopted by the department
 regarding the placement of a pregnant inmate in administrative
 segregation;
 (2)  information regarding the health care provided to
 a pregnant inmate, including the availability of:
 (A)  obstetrical or gynecological care;
 (B)  prenatal health care visits;
 (C)  mental health care; and
 (D)  drug abuse or chemical dependency treatment;
 (3)  a detailed summary of the following as applicable
 to pregnant inmates:
 (A)  nutritional standards, including the average
 caloric intake of a pregnant inmate and other dietary information;
 (B)  work assignments;
 (C)  housing conditions; and
 (D)  situations in which a pregnant inmate has
 been restrained, including the reason a determination to use
 restraints was made under Section 501.066, Government Code; and
 (4)  the number of miscarriages experienced by pregnant
 inmates while confined in a facility operated by or under contract
 with the department between September 1, 2017, and September 1,
 2018.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the department shall
 provide a copy of the report to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives; and
 (4)  each standing committee of the senate and house of
 representatives having primary jurisdiction over matters relating
 to corrections.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires February 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *