Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB239 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Hernandez, White (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 239
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
3- May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
4- Justice; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 239
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to a report regarding the confinement of pregnant inmates
126 by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "department" means the
159 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
1610 (b) The department shall prepare a report on the confinement
1711 of pregnant inmates in facilities operated by or under contract
1812 with the department. The report must include:
1913 (1) a description of the department's implementation
2014 of policies and procedures to provide adequate care to pregnant
2115 inmates while confined in a facility operated by or under contract
2216 with the department, and any policies adopted by the department
2317 regarding the placement of a pregnant inmate in administrative
2418 segregation;
2519 (2) information regarding the health care provided to
2620 a pregnant inmate, including the availability of:
2721 (A) obstetrical or gynecological care;
2822 (B) prenatal health care visits;
2923 (C) mental health care; and
3024 (D) drug abuse or chemical dependency treatment;
3125 (3) a detailed summary of the following as applicable
3226 to pregnant inmates:
3327 (A) nutritional standards, including the average
3428 caloric intake of a pregnant inmate and other dietary information;
3529 (B) work assignments;
3630 (C) housing conditions; and
3731 (D) situations in which a pregnant inmate has
3832 been restrained, including the reason a determination to use
3933 restraints was made under Section 501.066, Government Code; and
4034 (4) the number of miscarriages experienced by pregnant
4135 inmates while confined in a facility operated by or under contract
4236 with the department between September 1, 2017, and September 1,
4337 2018.
4438 (c) Not later than December 1, 2018, the department shall
4539 provide a copy of the report to:
4640 (1) the governor;
4741 (2) the lieutenant governor;
4842 (3) the speaker of the house of representatives; and
4943 (4) each standing committee of the senate and house of
5044 representatives having primary jurisdiction over matters relating
5145 to corrections.
5246 SECTION 2. This Act expires February 1, 2019.
5347 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
54- * * * * *
48+ ______________________________ ______________________________
49+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
50+ I certify that H.B. No. 239 was passed by the House on April
51+ 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 17, 2 present, not
52+ voting.
53+ ______________________________
54+ Chief Clerk of the House
55+ I certify that H.B. No. 239 was passed by the Senate on May
56+ 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
57+ ______________________________
58+ Secretary of the Senate
59+ APPROVED: _____________________
60+ Date
61+ _____________________
62+ Governor