House | 05/03/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2374 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 763 | Journal Page: 2374 |
House | 04/25/2017 | Postponed | 5/3/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1825 |
House | 04/25/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Postponed | 4/25/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1565 |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1565 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 791 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 791 | |
House | 02/24/2017 | Filed |